Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Alciati

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1762BornVercelli
24 Apr 178522.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 181755.2SelectedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
1 Oct 181755.4ConfirmedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
5 Oct 181755.4Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
26 Oct 182866.5DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Alciati:
Bishop Francesco Alciati (born , died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013