Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Pontifical Commission for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People | |||
19 March 1970 | Established | Pontifical Commission for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People | |
Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People | |||
28 June 1988 | Elevated | Congregation for Bishops
Pontifical Commission for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People | Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People |
1 January 2017 | Suppressed | Pontifical Council “Cor Unum” (suppressed)
Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace (suppressed) Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers (suppressed) Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People (suppressed) | Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development |
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024 |
✠