Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Duitama-Sogamoso

Dioecesis Duitamensis-Sogamosensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 4 June 1994
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tunja
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 4,928 (1,903 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Calle 13 N. 15-34, Duitama [Boyaca], Colombia
  • Telephone: (87)760.23.31

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Duitama
7 March 1955ErectedDiocese of Tunja (Duitama, Tibasosa, Sagamoso, Nobsa, Mongui, Tópaga, Mongua, Gámeza, Corrales, Floresta, Labranzagrande, Pisva, Paya, Morcóte, Santa Rosa de Viterbo, Cerinza, Belén, Tutasá, Paz de Rio, Betéitiva, Tasco, Socha, Socotá, Jericó, Sativasur, Sativanorte, ...) Diocese of Duitama (erected)
20 June 1964Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Duitama (from Bogotá)
7 July 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of Bucaramanga (Capitanejo, Carcasí, Cefitá, Cerrito, Concepción, Enciso, Guaca, Macaravita, Málaga, Molagavita, San Andrés, San José de Miranda, and San Miguel (all in García Rovira))
Diocese of Duitama (Boavita, Cobarachía, La Uvita, Soatá, Susacón, and Tipacoque (all in Norte) and Oliscas, El Cocuy, El Espino, Guacamayas, Güicán, Panqueva, and San Mateo (all in Gutiérrez))
Diocese of Málaga-Soatá (erected)
Diocese of Duitama-Sogamoso
4 June 1994Name ChangedDiocese of Duitama Diocese of Duitama-Sogamoso
29 October 1999Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Casanare (suppressed) (Sácama, Támara, Pore, Nunchía, Yopal, Pajarito, Recetor, Aguazul, Chámeza, Monterrey, Sabanalarga, and Villanueva)
Diocese of Duitama-Sogamoso (Part of Morcóte)
Diocese of Yopal (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Duitama
1966349,000351,96199.2%8212943,7126627243ap1967
1970398,000400,00099.5%818894,4711120145ap1971
1976448,000455,50098.4%828904,9771122051ap1977
1980476,000490,00097.1%766825,804721952ap1981
1990331,000343,00096.5%753784,243512746ap1991
Diocese of Duitama-Sogamoso
1999260,000280,00092.9%9641002,600128755ap2000
2000259,000278,00093.2%10461102,3541210258ap2001
2001270,000289,00093.4%11961252,1601711958ap2002
2002260,000265,00098.1%10671132,3001514458ap2003
2003261,000270,00096.7%10441082,416813859ap2004
2004310,000349,00088.8%10661122,7671013760ap2005
2006375,000394,00095.2%10861143,2891013062ap2007
2013418,000432,00096.8%12651313,19014812164ap2014
2016312,286353,81188.3%11351182,6461288664ap2017
2019301,046351,19685.7%13521372,1971179564ap2020
2021333,881381,18787.6%14231452,3021177763ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Duitama
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 47, Page 534, to Page 536
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 57, Page 361, and Page 362
  • Diocese of Duitama-Sogamoso
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 86, Page 832

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.8, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 11 Jul 2024