Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Territorial Prelature of Batanes

Praelatura Territorialis Batanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Danilo Bangayan Ulep, Prelate

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Territorial Prelature
  • Name Changed: 6 February 2002
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tuguegarao
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 784 (302 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprising the civil province of Batanes an the Babuyan Islands group which belongs to the province of Cagayan
  • Mailing Address: Prelate's Residence, Basco, 3900 Batanes, Philippines
  • Telephone: (0977)840-9402; (0928)496-4069

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands
30 November 1950ErectedDiocese of Tuguegarao Territorial Prelature of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands (erected)
29 June 1951Metropolitan ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands (from Manila)
21 September 1974Metropolitan ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands (from Nueva Segovia)
Territorial Prelature of Batanes
6 February 2002Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands Territorial Prelature of Batanes
2018Metropolitan ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Batanes (from Nueva Segovia to Tuguegarao)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands
196916,88817,36597.3%10101,6881046ap1971
198018,00018,80095.7%992,000917ap1981
199023,60024,40096.7%773,371747ap1991
199925,70028,00091.8%64102,570458ap2000
200017,21319,00590.6%5272,4592610ap2001
200124,80026,46593.7%38112,254868ap2002
Territorial Prelature of Batanes
200214,38431,47445.7%4481,798466ap2003
200316,21716,39698.9%4372,316356ap2004
200415,50516,47694.1%4372,215366ap2005
201316,46117,32795.0%121131,266146ap2014
201615,49617,24689.9%11111,40857ap2017
201917,51017,88097.9%232376136ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast