Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dennis Gerard Walsh

Bishop-Elect of Davenport, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1965 Born
1986²20.4Temporary VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1991²25.4Final VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
9 May 199226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Jul 200035.0IncardinatedPriest of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
25 Jun 202458.9AppointedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
27 Sep 202459.1Ordained BishopBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dennis Gerard Walsh
Father Dennis Gerard Walsh (born ) Bishop-Elect of Davenport

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, OH, Diocese of Toledo (in America), Ohio
Ordained PriestCrypt, Immaculate Conception, Basilica, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopDavenport, Diocese of Davenport, Iowa

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Davenport.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2024
  • mn: CB, 25 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 26 Jun 2024