Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Vollmar, S. M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Missua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1934Born
14 Mar 196429.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
4 Mar 199358.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
4 Mar 199358.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Missua
31 May 199358.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Missua
15 Oct 200975.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
2 May 202186.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Paul Vollmar (VIAF: 172085108)
Bishop Paul Vollmar S. M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÜberlingen
Ordained BishopAbbey, Einsiedeln
Death PlaceZurich

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,074
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast