Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wolfgang Haas

Archbishop of Vaduz, Liechtenstein


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1948 Born
7 Apr 197425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
25 Mar 198839.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
22 May 198839.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
22 May 199041.7SucceededBishop of Chur, Switzerland
2 Dec 199749.3AppointedArchbishop of Vaduz, Liechtenstein

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Haas (VIAF: 70658385)
Archbishop Wolfgang Haas (born ) Archbishop of Vaduz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaduz

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vaduz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,627
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast