Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Patricio Vera Soto

Bishop of Rancagua, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1958 Born
12 Jun 198224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
4 Apr 199132.8IncardinatedPriest of Melipilla, Chile
10 Apr 200344.8AppointedPrelate of Calama, Chile
31 May 200344.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Calama, Chile
20 Feb 201051.7AppointedBishop of San Juan Bautista de Calama, Chile
22 Feb 201455.7AppointedBishop of Iquique, Chile
29 Mar 201455.8InstalledBishop of Iquique, Chile
8 Jun 202163.0AppointedBishop of Rancagua, Chile
23 Jul 202163.1InstalledBishop of Rancagua, Chile

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Patricio Vera Soto
Bishop Guillermo Patricio Vera Soto (born ) Bishop of Rancagua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsla de Maipo
Ordained PriestCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopEstado Techado, Calama, Territorial Prelature of Calama

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rancagua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,400
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: CB, 24 Feb 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2021
  • c1: CB, 8 Jun 2021
  • i: CB, 22 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Jun 2021

Quantcast