Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Frederick Tonnos

Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1935 Born
27 May 196125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
13 May 198347.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
13 May 198347.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nationa
12 Jul 198347.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nationa
2 May 198448.7AppointedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
18 Jun 198448.8InstalledBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
24 Sep 201075.1RetiredBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Anthony Frederick Tonnos
Bishop Anthony Frederick Tonnos (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort Colborne
Ordained BishopSaint Catharines, Diocese of Saint Catharines, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hamilton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,541

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast