Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pier Giuliano Tiddia

Archbishop Emeritus of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1929 Born
29 Jun 195122.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cagliari, Italy
16 Dec 195122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
24 Dec 197445.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cagliari, Italy
24 Dec 197445.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Minturnae
2 Feb 197545.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Minturnae
30 Nov 198556.4AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
22 Apr 200676.8RetiredArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Giuliano Tiddia (VIAF: 36316751)
Archbishop Pier Giuliano Tiddia (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained DeaconCathedral, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained PriestIn Front of, Church, Sarroch, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Oristano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,526
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,604
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,654
  • od/c01: AM, 25 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jul 2021

Quantcast