Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Anthony Tamayo

Bishop of Laredo, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1949 Born
2 Apr 197525.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
11 Jun 197626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
26 Jan 199343.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
26 Jan 199343.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ita
10 Mar 199343.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ita
3 Jul 200050.6AppointedBishop of Laredo, Texas, USA
9 Aug 200050.7InstalledBishop of Laredo, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for James Anthony Tamayo
Bishop James Anthony Tamayo (born ) Bishop of Laredo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrownsville, Diocese of Brownsville, Texas
Ordained DeaconChrist the King, Church, Corpus Christi, Diocese of Corpus Christi, Texas
Ordained PriestCorpus Christi, Cathedral, Corpus Christi, Diocese of Corpus Christi, Texas
Ordained BishopSam Houston Coliseum, Houston, Diocese of Galveston-Houston, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Laredo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jun 2021

Quantcast