Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ducange Sylvain, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

Titular Bishop of Novae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1963Born
1992²28.7Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Jul 199532.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Jun 201653.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
4 Jun 201653.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Novae
27 Aug 201653.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novae
8 Jun 202158.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ducange Sylvain
Bishop Ducange Sylvain S.D.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort-au-Prince
Ordained BishopCathédrale transitoire Notre-Dame de l’Assomption, Port-au-Prince, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince
Death PlaceHôpital universitaire, Mirebalais

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 27 Jun 2016
  • name: CB, 1 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,087
  • d: CB, 8 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Jun 2021

Quantcast