Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Sundu

Bishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1973 Born
17 Jan 200632.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea
3 Apr 202147.6AppointedBishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea
3 Jul 202147.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Paul Sundu
Bishop Paul Sundu (born ) Bishop of Kundiawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWomatne, Simbu Province, Diocese of Goroka
Ordained BishopOutside, St. Mary's, Cathedral, Kundiawa, Diocese of Kundiawa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kundiawa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Jul 2021

Quantcast