Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Rui Manuel Sousa Valério, S.M.M.

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Apostolic Administrator of Portugal, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1964 Born
6 Oct 199025.7Perpetual VowsMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
23 Mar 199126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
27 Oct 201853.8AppointedBishop of Portugal, Military
25 Nov 201853.9Ordained BishopBishop of Portugal, Military
4 Dec 201853.9InstalledBishop of Portugal, Military
10 Aug 202358.6AppointedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
2 Sep 202358.6InstalledPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
2 Sep 202358.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Portugal, Military

MicroData Summary for Rui Manuel Sousa Valério
(WikiData: Q57821983)
Patriarch Rui Manuel Sousa Valério S.M.M. (born ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila Nova de Ourém, Diocese of Leiria
Ordained BishopSanta Maria de Belém (Mosteiro dos Jerónimos), Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Please contact the Patriarch through the Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Oct 2018
  • c34: CB, 25 Nov 2018
  • i: CB, 30 Nov 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,945
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Aug 2023
  • i: CB, 10 Aug 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 19 Jul 2024