Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alexandre Coutinho Lopes de Brito Palma

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Tepelta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1978 Born
2 Jul 200627.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Jun 202445.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Jun 202445.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tepelta
21 Jul 202445.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tepelta

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Coutinho Lopes de Brito Palma
(VIAF: 295687208; WikiData: Q93246720)
Father Alexandre Coutinho Lopes de Brito Palma (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Jorge de Arroios, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained PriestSanta Maria de Belém (Mosteiro dos Jerónimos), Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria de Belém (Mosteiro dos Jerónimos), Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Please contact the Father through the Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2024
  • ob: CB, 14 Jun 2024
  • c1: AK, 19 Jun 2024
  • c2+: AK, 15 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 16 Jul 2024