Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Nuno Isidro Nunes Cordeiro

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Sebarga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1964 Born
1 Jul 199025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Jun 202459.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Jun 202459.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebarga
21 Jul 202459.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebarga

MicroData Summary for Nuno Isidro Nunes Cordeiro
(WikiData: Q126617140)
Father Nuno Isidro Nunes Cordeiro (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceA-dos-Cunhados, Torres Vedras, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained PriestSanta Maria de Belém (Mosteiro dos Jerónimos), Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria de Belém (Mosteiro dos Jerónimos), Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Please contact the Father through the Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2024
  • ob: CB, 14 Jun 2024
  • c1: AK, 19 Jun 2024
  • c2+: AK, 15 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 16 Jul 2024