Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Berhaneyesus Demerew Cardinal Souraphiel, C.M.

Archbishop of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia

Cardinal-Priest of San Romano Martire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1948 Born
4 Jul 197627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
199445.4AppointedPrefect of Jimma-Bonga, Ethiopia
7 Nov 199749.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
7 Nov 199749.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bita
25 Jan 199849.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bita
7 Jul 199950.9AppointedArchbishop of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
14 Feb 201566.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201566.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Romano Martire
18 Oct 201567.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Romano Martire

MicroData Summary for Berhaneyesus Demerew Souraphiel
(WikiData: Q820563)
Berhaneyesus Demerew Cardinal Souraphiel C.M. (born ) Archbishop of Addis Abeba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTchela Claka, Vicariate Apostolic of Harar
Ordained BishopNativité, Cathedral, Addis Abeba, Archeparchy of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian)

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archeparchy of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,227
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • i: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 15 Jul 2024