Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pius Sin Hozel

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Belesasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1968 Born
3 Feb 199627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
22 May 202152.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
22 May 202152.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Belesasa
29 Jun 202152.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belesasa

MicroData Summary for Pius Sin Hozel
Father Pius Sin Hozel (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Busan {Pusan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBusan, Diocese of Busan {Pusan}
Ordained BishopBusan, Diocese of Busan {Pusan}

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Busan {Pusan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 4 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jun 2021

Quantcast