Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yaacoub Camil Afram Antoine Semaan

Patriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Siri

Patriarchal Administrator of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian)

Patriarchal Administrator of Sudan and South Sudan (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1980 Born
24 Jun 200626.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 201939.5AppointedAdministrator of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine
28 Mar 202039.9ConfirmedPatriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine
28 Mar 202039.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Siri
15 Apr 202039.9AppointedPatriarchal Administrator of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
15 Apr 202039.9AppointedPatriarchal Administrator of Sudan and South Sudan (Syrian)
15 Aug 202040.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Siri
3 Jul 202141.1InstalledPatriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine

MicroData Summary for Yaacoub Camil Afram Antoine Semaan
Bishop Yaacoub Camil Afram Antoine Semaan (born ) Patriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeirut
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l’Annonciation, Cathedral, Beirut

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchal Exarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2020
  • ab: CB, 15 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Aug 2020
  • c34: CB, 15 Aug 2020
  • fb: CB, 16 Aug 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 245, Number 20,461
  • i: AM, 16 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jul 2021

Quantcast