Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neil Sebastian Ricardo Scantlebury

Bishop of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1965 Born
18 May 199529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
28 Dec 202055.2AppointedBishop of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles
1 Mar 202155.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles
11 Jun 202155.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bridgetown, Barbados, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Neil Sebastian Ricardo Scantlebury
Bishop Neil Sebastian Ricardo Scantlebury (born ) Bishop of Bridgetown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBridgetown, Diocese of Saint George’s in Grenada
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick’s, Cathedral, Bridgetown, Diocese of Bridgetown, Barbados

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bridgetown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 28 Dec 2020
  • aadm: CB, 1 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 28 Mar 2021
  • bp: CB, 23 Apr 2021
  • c1: CB, 30 May 2021
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jun 2021

Quantcast