Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Salaverry Villarreal, O.P.

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

Titular Bishop of Acelum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1969 Born
11 Mar 199727.5First VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1 May 200030.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Oct 200031.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Feb 202151.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
10 Feb 202151.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Acelum
21 May 202151.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acelum

MicroData Summary for Juan José Salaverry Villarreal
Bishop Juan José Salaverry Villarreal O.P. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Apr 2021
  • od/c01: CB, 21 Apr 2021
  • ~c2: CB, 1 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 14 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 May 2021

Quantcast