Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Alan Saunders

Bishop Emeritus of Broome, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1950 Born
28 Aug 197626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Broome, Australia
3 Nov 199545.8AppointedBishop of Broome, Australia
8 Feb 199646.0Ordained BishopBishop of Broome, Australia
28 Aug 202171.6ResignedBishop of Broome, Australia

MicroData Summary for Christopher Alan Saunders
Bishop Christopher Alan Saunders (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Broome

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne
Ordained BishopShire Civic Centre, Broome, Diocese of Broome

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Broome.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,684
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Aug 2021

Quantcast