Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Rosa

Deceased

Archbishop of Perugia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1867Born
17 Apr 189225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mantova, Italy
11 Dec 192255.7AppointedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
17 Dec 192255.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
1 Mar 192355.9InstalledArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
29 Oct 194275.6DiedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rosa (VIAF: 90211946)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Rosa (born , died ) Archbishop of Perugia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSermide
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePerugia, Archdiocese of Perugia
Buried Place (Original)San Lorenzo, Cathedral, Perugia, Archdiocese of Perugia

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1922, Number 77
  • c1/opd/loc: CB, 12 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast