Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vicente Ribas Prats

Bishop-Elect of Ibiza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1968 Born
12 Oct 199628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ibiza, Spain
4 Feb 202051.7AppointedAdministrator of Ibiza, Spain
13 Oct 202153.4AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
4 Dec 202153.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Ribas Prats
Father Vicente Ribas Prats (born ) Bishop-Elect of Ibiza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant Antoni de Portmany, Diocese of Ibiza
Ordained PriestCathedral, Ibiza, Diocese of Ibiza
Ordained BishopRecinto Ferial, Ibiza, Diocese of Ibiza

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Ibiza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Oct 2021

Quantcast