Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos Pirán Gómez

Auxiliary Bishop of Holguín, Cuba

Titular Bishop of Boseta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1961 Born
9 Dec 198827.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
19 Mar 202160.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Holguín, Cuba
19 Mar 202160.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Boseta
15 May 202160.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Boseta

MicroData Summary for Marcos Pirán Gómez
Bishop Marcos Pirán Gómez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Holguín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Ordained BishopSan Isidoro, Cathedral, Holguín, Diocese of Holguín

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Holguín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2021
  • c2+: CB, 15 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 May 2021

Quantcast