Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Evangelista Pimentel Lavrador

Bishop of Viana do Castelo, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1956 Born
14 Jun 198125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Coimbra, Portugal
7 May 200852.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
7 May 200852.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Luperciana
29 Jun 200852.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Luperciana
29 Sep 201559.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Angra, Portugal
15 Mar 201660.0SucceededBishop of Angra, Portugal
21 Sep 202165.5AppointedBishop of Viana do Castelo, Portugal
27 Nov 202165.7InstalledBishop of Viana do Castelo, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João Evangelista Pimentel Lavrador
Bishop João Evangelista Pimentel Lavrador (born ) Bishop of Viana do Castelo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeixo de Mira
Ordained BishopCathedral, Coimbra, Diocese of Coimbra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viana do Castelo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,770
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2015
  • s: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2021
  • i: CB, 29 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Sep 2021

Quantcast