Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Lucien Picandet

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1931Born
3 Apr 196129.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 198149.4AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
28 Jun 198149.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
20 Oct 199765.8DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for René Lucien Picandet (VIAF: 39413328)
Bishop René Lucien Picandet (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurdat-Larequille
Ordained BishopSte Croix, Cathedral, Orléans, Diocese of Orléans

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast