Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Marcel Émile Nicolas Perron, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Djibouti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1925Born
8 Sep 194520.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jun 195126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Jul 198156.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Harar, Ethiopia
3 Jul 198762.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Djibouti
21 Nov 199267.8AppointedBishop of Djibouti
14 Mar 199368.1Ordained BishopBishop of Djibouti
13 Mar 200176.1RetiredBishop of Djibouti
6 May 202196.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Djibouti

MicroData Summary for Georges Marcel Émile Nicolas Perron
Bishop Georges Marcel Émile Nicolas Perron O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Djibouti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChemillé, France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de la Trinité, Basilica, Blois, Diocese of Blois, France
Death PlaceAngers, Diocese of Angers, France

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,059
  • d/aadm: CB, 8 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast