Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Pepito Palang, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Jose in Mindoro, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1946Born
8 Jul 197226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
25 Mar 200255.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Jose in Mindoro, Philippines
25 Mar 200255.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
31 May 200255.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
17 Mar 201871.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of San Jose in Mindoro, Philippines
21 Apr 202174.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Jose in Mindoro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pepito Palang
Bishop Antonio Pepito Palang S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Jose in Mindoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcepcion
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Jose, Vicariate Apostolic of San Jose in Mindoro
Death PlaceCebu Doctors, Hospital, Cebu, Archdiocese of Cebu

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,193
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2018
  • d: CB, 21 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Apr 2021

Quantcast