Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cutbert Martin O’Gara, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yuanling [YŘanling], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1886Born
191427.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
26 May 191529.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
12 Feb 193043.8AppointedPrefect of Shenchow, China
28 May 193448.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Elis
28 May 193448.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shenchow, China
28 Oct 193448.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elis
11 Apr 194660.0AppointedBishop of Yuanling [YŘanling], China
13 May 196882.1DiedBishop of Yuanling [YŘanling], China

MicroData Summary for Cutbert Martin O’Gara
Bishop Cutbert Martin O’Gara C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Yuanling [YŘanling]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOttawa, Diocese of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
Ordained BishopHankow
Death PlaceTeaneck, NJ, USA

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1934, Number 71
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast