Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Javier Muñoz y Capurón, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1858Born
30 Jul 192162.6AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
24 Aug 192162.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Guatemala
24 Jan 192768.1DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Luis Javier Muñoz y Capurón
Archbishop Luis Javier Muñoz y Capurón S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast