Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edwin Mwansa Mulandu

Bishop of Mpika, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1969 Born
4 Aug 200132.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ndola, Zambia
24 Apr 202151.7AppointedBishop of Mpika, Zambia
3 Jul 202151.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mpika, Zambia
10 Jul 202151.9InstalledBishop of Mpika, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Edwin Mwansa Mulandu
Bishop Edwin Mwansa Mulandu (born ) Bishop of Mpika

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMufulira, Diocese of Ndola
Ordained BishopChild Jesus, Cathedral, Lusaka, Archdiocese of Lusaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mpika.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2021
  • mn: CB, 24 Apr 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 May 2021
  • i: CB, 3 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jul 2021

Quantcast