Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Mulagada

Deceased

Bishop of Eluru, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1937Born
4 Jan 196527.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 197638.9AppointedBishop of Eluru, India
5 May 197739.3Ordained BishopBishop of Eluru, India
16 Aug 200971.6DiedBishop of Eluru, India

MicroData Summary for John Mulagada
Bishop John Mulagada (born , died ) Bishop of Eluru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarriveedu
Ordained BishopVisakhapatnam, Diocese of Visakhapatnam

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,667
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast