Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Laurent Cardinal Monsengwo Pasinya

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” in Ostia mare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1939Born
21 Dec 196324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Feb 198040.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Feb 198040.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
4 May 198040.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
7 Apr 198141.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Sep 198848.9AppointedArchbishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Dec 200768.1AppointedArchbishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Feb 200868.3InstalledArchbishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Nov 201071.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201071.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” in Ostia mare
22 Jan 201171.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Pacis” in Ostia mare
13 Apr 201373.5AppointedMember of the Council of Cardinals
Oct 2018²78.9ResignedMember of the Council of Cardinals
1 Nov 201879.0RetiredArchbishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Jul 202181.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Laurent Monsengwo Pasinya (VIAF: 19311)
Laurent Cardinal Monsengwo Pasinya (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kinshasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMongobele
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Esplanade du Palais du Peuple, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa
Death PlaceClinique de l'Europe, Le Port-Marly, France

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
  • a cardinal for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2007
  • i: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Nov 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,569
  • d: CB, 11 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jul 2021

Quantcast