Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Domba Mady

Deceased

Bishop of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1953Born
14 Sep 198027.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 199441.1AppointedBishop of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Jul 199441.5Ordained BishopBishop of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Jul 202168.4DiedBishop of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Richard Domba Mady
Bishop Richard Domba Mady (born , died ) Bishop of Doruma-Dungu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Dungu, Diocese of Doruma-Dungu
Death PlaceHJ, Hospital, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,476
  • d: CB, 3 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jul 2021

Quantcast