Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maksimilijan Matjaž

Bishop of Celje, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1963 Born
29 Jun 198925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Maribor, Slovenia
5 Mar 202157.5AppointedBishop of Celje, Slovenia
30 May 202157.7Ordained BishopBishop of Celje, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Maksimilijan Matjaž
Bishop Maksimilijan Matjaž (born ) Bishop of Celje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceČrna na Koroškem, Diocese of Maribor
Ordained BishopSaints Mohor and Fortunat, Church, Gornji Grad, Diocese of Celje

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Celje.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2021
  • bp: CB, 5 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 11 Mar 2021
  • c2+: CB, 12 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 May 2021

Quantcast