Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Leonetti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1902Born
11 Apr 192522.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 194240.0AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
31 May 194240.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
10 Jul 196260.2AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
Jul 1963³61.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caiazzo, Italy
1 Mar 197875.8RetiredArchbishop of Capua, Italy
5 Jun 197876.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Caiazzo, Italy
28 Dec 198179.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Leonetti
Archbishop Tommaso Leonetti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefiascone, Diocese of Montefiascone
Ordained BishopMontefiascone, Diocese of Montefiascone

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,860
  • aadm: CB, 1 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Sep 2021

Quantcast