Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Lao y Cuevas

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1780Born
12 Sep 184767.4SelectedBishop of Teruel, Spain
17 Dec 184767.7ConfirmedBishop of Teruel, Spain
19 Mar 184868.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
20 Sep 184969.5SelectedBishop of Guadix, Spain
7 Jan 185069.8ConfirmedBishop of Guadix, Spain
14 Jul 185070.3DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lao y Cuevas
Bishop Antonio Lao y Cuevas (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTiñana
Ordained BishopMadrid

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 293, and Page 542
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 154, Number 840
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 16
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,734
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast