Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis María Cardinal Borbón y Vallábriga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1777Born
13 Mar 179921.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 179921.8AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
2 Jun 179922.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
20 Oct 180023.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 Oct 180023.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala
22 Dec 180023.5AppointedAdministrator of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
22 Dec 180023.5AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
19 May 181436.9ResignedAdministrator of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
29 Dec 181437.6ResignedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
19 Mar 182345.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis María Borbón y Vallábriga (VIAF: 89054668)
Luis María Cardinal Borbón y Vallábriga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCadalso de la Vidrios

  • a priest for 24.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
  • a cardinal for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 372
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 119, Number 626
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 3
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,037

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast