Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Sentmenat y Castellá

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1734Born
23 Sep 175824.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 178348.8AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
24 Feb 178348.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
19 Aug 178349.3SelectedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
22 Jun 178450.1ResignedBishop of Ávila, Spain
25 Jun 178450.1ConfirmedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
30 Mar 178954.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Apr 180671.9DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sentmenat y Castellá
Antonio Cardinal Sentmenat y Castellá (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona
Ordained BishopS. Maria di Montserrato, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoyal Palace, Aranjuez
Buried Place (Original)Royal Palace, Chapel, Aranjuez

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
  • a cardinal for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Mar 1789
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 62, and Page 244
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 99, Number 515
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast