Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Kouamé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1927Born
8 Jul 195628.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 198153.2AppointedBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
31 May 198153.4Ordained BishopBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
21 Nov 200375.9RetiredBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
17 May 202193.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Bruno Kouamé
Bishop Bruno Kouamé (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Abengourou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnoumaba
Ordained BishopAbengourou, Diocese of Abengourou
Death PlaceBouaké, Archdiocese of Bouaké

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,384
  • d: CB, 17 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 May 2021

Quantcast