Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sebastian Koto Cardinal Khoarai, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mohale’s Hoek, Lesotho

Cardinal-Priest of San Leonardo da Porto Maurizio ad Acilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1929Born
6 Jan 195121.3ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
21 Dec 195627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
10 Nov 197748.1AppointedBishop of Mohale’s Hoek, Lesotho
2 Apr 197848.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mohale’s Hoek, Lesotho
11 Feb 201484.4RetiredBishop of Mohale’s Hoek, Lesotho
19 Nov 201687.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201687.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Leonardo da Porto Maurizio ad Acilia
17 Apr 202191.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mohale’s Hoek, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Koto Khoarai
Sebastian Koto Cardinal Khoarai O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mohale’s Hoek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoaling, Diocese of Leribe
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Mohale’s Hoek, Diocese of Mohale’s Hoek
Death PlaceLebreton House, Mazenod

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2014
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • ~i: CB, 1 Mar 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,250
  • d: CB, 18 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast