Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Kelanthara

Deceased

Archbishop of Verapoly, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1918Born
18 Mar 194931.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 197152.9AppointedArchbishop of Verapoly, India
4 Apr 197153.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Verapoly, India
19 Oct 198668.7DiedArchbishop of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kelanthara
Archbishop Joseph Kelanthara (born , died ) Archbishop of Verapoly

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanangad
Ordained BishopSt. Francis of Assis, Kerala

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 18, Number 959

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast