Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Alfonso Jourdán Alvariza

Bishop of Melo, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1964 Born
5 Nov 199531.7Ordained PriestPriest of Minas, Uruguay
24 Jul 201854.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
24 Jul 201854.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Medianas Zabuniorum
30 Sep 201854.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medianas Zabuniorum
15 Sep 202157.6AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
30 Oct 202157.7InstalledBishop of Melo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Pablo Alfonso Jourdán Alvariza
Bishop Pablo Alfonso Jourdán Alvariza (born ) Bishop of Melo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Melo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Jul 2018
  • c34: CB, 30 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,862
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2021
  • i: CB, 28 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Sep 2021

Quantcast