Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Alexandre Édouard Élie Jordy

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1961 Born
28 Jun 199231.4Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
19 Sep 200847.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
19 Sep 200847.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Idassa
11 Nov 200847.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Idassa
22 Jul 201150.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
16 Oct 201150.7InstalledBishop of Saint-Claude, France
4 Nov 201958.7AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
5 Jan 202058.9InstalledArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Vincent Alexandre Édouard Élie Jordy
Archbishop Vincent Alexandre Édouard Élie Jordy (born ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerpignan
Ordained BishopCathedral, Strasbourg, Archdiocese of Strasbourg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tours.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,984
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2011
  • i: MW, 4 Sep 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast