Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ryan Pagente Jimenez

Archbishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1971 Born
8 Dec 200331.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chalan Kanoa, Northern Mariana Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
28 Nov 201038.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chalan Kanoa, Northern Mariana Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
24 Jun 201644.5AppointedBishop of Chalan Kanoa, Northern Mariana Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
14 Aug 201644.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chalan Kanoa, Northern Mariana Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
6 Jul 202452.5AppointedArchbishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Aug 202452.6InstalledArchbishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Ryan Pagente Jimenez
(WikiData: Q24758446)
Archbishop Ryan Pagente Jimenez (born ) Archbishop of Agaña

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDumaguete City, Philippines
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Mount Carmel, Cathedral, Chalan Kanoa, Diocese of Chalan Kanoa, Northern Mariana Islands

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Agaña.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Jun 2016
  • mi/c1: CB, 27 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,074
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2024
  • i: CB, 6 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 8 Jul 2024