Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Maria Hồ Ngọc Cẩn

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bi Chu, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Zenobias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1876Born
20 Dec 190226.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 193558.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
11 Mar 193558.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenobias
29 Jun 193558.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenobias
17 Jun 193659.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
28 Nov 194871.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Bi Chu, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Dominique Maria Hồ Ngọc Cẩn
Bishop Dominique Maria Hồ Ngọc Cẩn (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bi Chu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBa Chu

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1935, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Jul 2021

Quantcast