Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe González González, O.F.M. Cap.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroní, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Sinnuara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1944 Born
14 Aug 196217.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Mar 197025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Nov 198540.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tucupita, Venezuela
25 Nov 198540.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinnuara
6 Jan 198641.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinnuara
2 Mar 198641.2InstalledVicar Apostolic of Tucupita, Venezuela
26 May 201469.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela
16 Aug 201469.6InstalledVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela
27 Apr 202176.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Felipe González González
Bishop Felipe González González O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroní

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Diocese of Madrid, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Caroní.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 May 2014
  • i: CB, 31 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 95, Number 8,142
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast