Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Shorot Francis Gomes

Bishop of Sylhet, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1965 Born
31 May 199024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dhaka, Bangladesh
8 Feb 201650.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh
8 Feb 201650.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Forma
22 Apr 201650.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forma
12 May 202155.4AppointedBishop of Sylhet, Bangladesh
20 Jul 202155.5InstalledBishop of Sylhet, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Shorot Francis Gomes
Bishop Shorot Francis Gomes (born ) Bishop of Sylhet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHashnabad
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Dhaka, Archdiocese of Dhaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sylhet.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 2 Mar 2016
  • c2+: CB, 19 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,897
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 May 2021
  • i: CB, 20 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Jul 2021

Quantcast