Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bejoy Nicephorus D’Cruze, O.M.I.

Archbishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1956 Born
1 Nov 198630.7ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 Feb 198731.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Feb 200549.0AppointedBishop of Khulna, Bangladesh
6 May 200549.2Ordained BishopBishop of Khulna, Bangladesh
8 Jul 201155.4AppointedBishop of Sylhet, Bangladesh
30 Sep 201155.6InstalledBishop of Sylhet, Bangladesh
30 Sep 202064.6AppointedArchbishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh
27 Nov 202064.7InstalledArchbishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Bejoy Nicephorus D’Cruze
Archbishop Bejoy Nicephorus D’Cruze O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop of Dhaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuital
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Cathedral, Khulna, Diocese of Khulna

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Dhaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2011
  • i: CB, 2 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,882
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2020
  • i: AM, 19 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 May 2021

Quantcast